+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 716 (effective - see bill)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1996ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (62-Y 32-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 32-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chair votes Yes
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105067D-S1
- Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1996S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 20-N)
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House 13105067D-S1 (1-Y 95-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 3-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Massie, Greason, Howell, A.T.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Stanley, McWaters, Carrico
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13105067D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 35-N)
- Read third time and passed House (65-Y 35-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 13101180D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1996E
- Amendments by Delegate Toscano rejected
- VOTE: REJECTED (30-Y 68-N)
- Amendment by Delegate Surovell rejected (30-Y 68-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 6-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #3
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101180D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (15)
February 22, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 22, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 32-N)
February 22, 2013: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N)
February 22, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 13, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
February 13, 2013: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
February 13, 2013: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2013: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 20-N)
February 13, 2013: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 3-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Finance with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 35-N)
February 4, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (30-Y 68-N)
January 30, 2013: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 6-N)
January 25, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor