+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0320)
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 320 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1992ER)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (13-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 013395680-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 013395680-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 013395680-H1
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture w/substitute (20-Y 2-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture sub-committee: 2
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 015989204
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
February 19, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (13-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from Agriculture w/substitute (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor