+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Letter sent to Supreme Court
- Left in Courts of Justice with letter
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 46-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (52-Y 46-N 1-A)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Amendments by Delegate Ingram agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1990E
- Printed as engrossed 11100222D-E
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 8-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100222D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 46-N 1-A)
February 4, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor