+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 559 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1990ER)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 032322644
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: Reported from General Laws with amd (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2003: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor