+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 543 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB199ER)
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 10106019D-H1
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Colgan, Puckett, Locke
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Delegates: Cox, M.K., Landes, Dance
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 98-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 10105594D-S1 (2-Y 98-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105594D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB199S1
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105594D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources
On January 8, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101113D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 2010: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 12, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2010: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2010: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 98-N)
March 2, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor