+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 300 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1988ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1988H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104066D-H1
- Read second time
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104066D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100019D
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 22, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor