+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Tra. (HB1570-Black) by voice vote
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 6-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 6-N 2-A)
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 016054636
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 6-N 2-A)
February 2, 2001: Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor