+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Finance (12-Y 5-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 992683204-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 992683204-H1
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (23-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 992683204-H1
On February 2, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: Capital Outlay
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 992625204
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 1999: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (12-Y 5-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (23-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor