+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0644)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 644 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1982ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 090062624-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1982E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 090062624
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2009: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor