+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 22, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 20 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1982ER)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 977686364