+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
On April 9, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 337 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB198ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (92-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 6-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989688324-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989688324-H1
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989688324-H1
- Read first time
- Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 6-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987356324
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 6-N)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor