+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 375 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1979ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 36-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106595D-S1 (63-Y 36-N)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106595D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Peake rejected
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1979S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (28-Y 12-N)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19106595D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 36-N)
- Read third time and passed House (61-Y 36-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 7-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101108D