+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 238 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1979ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11101933D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1979E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101933D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor