+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 4-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
- Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee on Appropriations amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Committee on Rules substitute agreed to 21103175D-H1
- Amendments by Delegate Reid agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1978EH1
- Printed as engrossed 21103175D-EH1
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (11-Y 7-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 21103175D-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 5-N)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101025D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 2021: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 4-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
January 27, 2021: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (11-Y 7-N)
January 26, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
January 22, 2021: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor