+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 106 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1976ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103494D
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor