+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 9, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0863)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 863 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1976ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 999313196-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 999313196-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 999313196-H1
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 995205196
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1999: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor