+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 16, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 433 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1975ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102521D