+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1975ER)
- Enrolled
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11100321D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1975E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100321D