+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 8, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 834 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1974ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Prof.
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 993729196