+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 262 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1974ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 071531302-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1974E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (19-Y 3-N)
On January 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 071531302
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
January 19, 2007: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor