+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 14, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)
On March 6, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 134 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1972ER)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 2-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 973492120-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Mr. Baker agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
On January 10, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 973492120