+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 78 (effective 7/1/05)
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1971ER)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Agr., Chesapeake & Natural Res. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 051661284
+ − Votes (5)
February 9, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2005: Reported from Agr., Chesapeake & Natural Res. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor