+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (61)
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- VOTE: Conference (63-Y 32-N)
- No further action taken
- House requested conference committee #2 (63-Y 32-N)
On February 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (23-Y 16-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N)
- VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (31-Y 7-N)
- Pending question ordered (31-Y 7-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 011029548-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 011029548-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 6-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 13-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Pending question ordered
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 50-N)
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senators: Watkins, Howell, Barry
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Delegates: McClure, Sherwood, Joannou
- House acceded to request
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (41-Y 50-N)
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 011029548-S1
On February 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (7-Y 5-N)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Read third time
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (8-Y 7-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (57-Y 40-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 40-N)
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Amendment by Del. McEachin rejected (37-Y 55-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (37-Y 55-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended (66-Y 29-N)
- Printed as engrossed 017136832-E
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (66-Y 29-N)
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from M. & P. with amendment (16-Y 4-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to M. & P. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 017136832
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (15)
February 24, 2001: VOTE: Conference (63-Y 32-N)
February 23, 2001: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (23-Y 16-N)
February 23, 2001: VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (31-Y 7-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 6-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 50-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 13-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (7-Y 5-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2001: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 7-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 40-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (66-Y 29-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (37-Y 55-N)
February 3, 2001: Reported from M. & P. with amendment (16-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor