+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 698 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1966ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1966H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105113D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19105113D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101136D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
February 18, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2019: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N)
January 29, 2019: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor