+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- No action taken by Appropriations by voice vote
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed LD3626208
+ − Vote
February 3, 1995: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor