+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 578 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1964ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (11-Y 3-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102369D
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2013: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 3-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor