+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 690 (effective 7/1/15)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1964ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 15105591D-H2
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Obenshain, Howell, McDougle
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Delegates: Hugo, Bell, Robert B., Watts
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 15105142D-S1 (1-Y 95-N)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105142D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1964S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105142D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1964H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104694D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 15104694D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103251D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
February 27, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2015: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
February 18, 2015: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor