+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 237 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1963ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101260D