+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 9, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0845)
On May 5, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 845 (effective 7/1/95)
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED (7-Y 89-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (7-Y 89-N)
On March 29, 1995 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed LD3291812-H2
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1962ER)
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Floor amendments agreed to (Calhoun)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD4476136-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD4476136-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4476136-H1
- Reported from I. C. with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation
- Presented & ordered printed LD8568136
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 5, 1995: VOTE: REJECTED (7-Y 89-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from I. C. with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor