+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N)
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 5-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On December 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100840D
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2014: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N)
January 24, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N)
January 20, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor