+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0060)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 60 (effective - see bill)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB196ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N)
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB196H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104611D-H1
- Read second time
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104611D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: #1 Standards of Quality
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101666D