+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 407 (effective 7/1/21)
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1958ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (32-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (83-Y 17-N)
- Read third time and passed House (83-Y 17-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 5-N)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100821D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2021: Passed Senate (32-Y 5-N)
February 18, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2021: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2021: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 17-N)
January 20, 2021: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor