+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 5, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
On March 27, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 601 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1958ER)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 990676203