+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279)
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 279 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1957ER)
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (21-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 978025845