+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
- Enacted, Chapter 738 (effective 7/1/15)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1955ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 20-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (75-Y 20-N)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1955ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N)
- Read third time and passed House (67-Y 31-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102593D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 15, 2015: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 20-N)
February 16, 2015: Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N)
February 16, 2015: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N)
February 16, 2015: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N)
January 26, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor