+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 134 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1955ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103353D
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N)
January 25, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
January 11, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor