+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 21, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 311 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1953ER)
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to LD2094432-H1
- Title replaced
- Floor amendments agreed to (Robinson)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds. LD2094432-EH1
- Printed as engrossed LD2094432-EH1
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD2094432-H1
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed LD2001288
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: Reported from C. & L. with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor