+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)
On March 18, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 382 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1952ER)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD4720288-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed LD4720288
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1995: Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor