+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1952S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 097334664-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 097334664-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1952H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 094191664-H1
- Read second time
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 094191664-H1
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 094347840