+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 373 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1949ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (24-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 2
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 990428450