+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (10-Y 4-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 38-N)
- Read third time and passed House (61-Y 38-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1947H1
- Amendment by Delegate Levine rejected
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106188D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106188D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 7-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103234D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2019: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (10-Y 4-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 38-N)
February 1, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 7-N)
January 21, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor