+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
On March 26, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 795 (effective - see bill)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1947ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1947H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053137496-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 053137496-H1
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (19-Y 3-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056781496
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from Appropriations with sub (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor