+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 117 (effective 7/1/95)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1946ER)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Read first time
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD4762812
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1995: Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor