+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 355 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1945ER)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 030918736-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 030918736-H1
- Read second time
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 030918736-H1
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 13, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 030879736
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2003: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 29, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2003: Reported from General Laws with sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor