+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective-2/28/94)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB194ER)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7170416 (HB194S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed LD7163605 (HB194H1)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute
- Substitute by Del. Putney agreed to
- Committee amendments rejected
- Read second time
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor