+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 346 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1933ER)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 5-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1933H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104433D-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17104433D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N)
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101819D
+ − Votes (7)
February 17, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N)
January 27, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
January 26, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N)
January 26, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor