+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 70 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1931ER)
- Enrolled
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 4-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (91-Y 4-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 5-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 12-N)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 5-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100410D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 10, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 4-N)
February 8, 2017: Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 12-N)
February 8, 2017: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2017: Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 5-N)
February 7, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 5-N)
January 26, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
January 20, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N)
January 18, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor