+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 7/1/94)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB193ER)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor