+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/17)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB1929ER)
- Engrossed bill reprinted 17103562D-E
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1929ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 17103562D-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1929E
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103562D