+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 698 (effective 7/1/13)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1927ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (5-Y 92-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators: Reeves, Garrett, Marsh
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Morris, Lingamfelter, Lopez
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1927E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 13101984D-E
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101984D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
February 23, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N)
February 21, 2013: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2013: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor